Garcia v. Knight Refrigerated et al
Plaintiff: Beatrice Garcia
Defendant: Joshua Paladino and Knight Refrigerated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00624
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. (las)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Defendants Knight Refrigerated, Joshua Paladino. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice)(Skeen, Nathan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. The deadline to comply with Paragraph 2 of #4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE has expired. The parties are hereby ordered to comply with Paragraph 2 within fourteen (14) days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/17/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Notice of Removal) (las)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Knight Refrigerated, Joshua Paladino. (Skeen, Nathan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Beatrice Garcia and Defendants Knight Refrigerated, Joshua Paladino. (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/6/2019. (las)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/5/2019. (las)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Salt Lake County, case number 190906189, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3365401) filed by Knight Refrigerated, Joshua Paladino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Joshua Paladino, #4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Michelle Marie Carapellese, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Skeen, Nathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Defendants Knight Refrigerated and Joshua Paladino are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Knight Refrigerated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Paladino
Represented By: Nathan R. Skeen
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Refrigerated
Represented By: Nathan R. Skeen
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Garcia
Represented By: Gabriel K. White
Represented By: Daniel S. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?