Garman v. Gehman
Plaintiff: John Paul Garman
Defendant: FNU Gehman
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00632
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff John Paul Garman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for a stay in state court filed by Defendant FNU Gehman. (Chesnut, Heather)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for a stay in state court filed by Plaintiff John Paul Garman. (kpf)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Notice of ADR was entered on a Prisoner Pro Se Notice of Removal. Correction: Docket text stricken. re #3 Notice of ADR. (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY ERROR: Notice of ADR cannot be entered in prisoner pro se cases NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff John Paul Garman and Defendant FNU Gehman. (tlh) Modified on 9/6/2019 by striking text (tlh).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190906028, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3366215) filed by FNU Gehman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Tort Complaint and Demand for Jury, #3 Exhibit Request for Official Service of Process, #4 Exhibit Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #5 Exhibit (PROPOSED) order for appointment of counsel, #6 Exhibit Application to Proceed in Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #7 Exhibit (PROPOSED) order to proceed without prepaymeint fees or costs (incorrect court heading), #8 Exhibit Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, #9 Exhibit Letter to USP re inmate accounting, #10 Exhibit Correspondence from Plaintiff- request for update, #11 Exhibit Ruling and Order (filing fee waived, def to respond to complaint within 30days), #12 Exhibit Request for Defendants to be added to case, #13 Exhibit Motion to add exhibits A, B and C to Case, #14 Exhibit Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B, #16 Exhibit Exhibit C, #17 Exhibit Minute Entry) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Chesnut, Heather)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Defendant FNU Gehman, Sergeant is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garman v. Gehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gehman
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?