Woods v. Minor et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Donald Woods
Defendant: Kramerica Industries of Idaho, Carter Ruth Pilcher Minor and Todd Hunter
Case Number: 2:2019cv00635
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff has up to and including October 30, 2019, to file his Opposition to #13 Kramerica's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/24/19. (dla)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant Kramerica Industries of Idaho, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jesse Donald Woods. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasmussen, Brady) Modified by correcting event type on 10/24/2019 (dla).
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Carter Ruth Pilcher Minor. (nl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jesse Donald Woods. (nl)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Kramerica Industries of Idaho. (nl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Todd Hunter. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Kramerica Industries of Idaho. (Spencer, Sarah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Todd Hunter, Kramerica Industries of Idaho, Carter Ruth Pilcher Minor, Plaintiff Jesse Donald Woods. Form due by 10/4/2019. (nl)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Kramerica Industries of Idaho answer due 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/19/2019. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Felipe Morelli on behalf of Kramerica Industries of Idaho (Morelli, Andres)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Alder on behalf of Kramerica Industries of Idaho (Alder, Nathan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Kramerica Industries of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Sarah E. Spencer added to party Kramerica Industries of Idaho(pty:dft)(Spencer, Sarah)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Carter Ruth Pilcher Minor. (Evans, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Acceptance of Service, #3 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Todd Hunter and Plaintiff Jesse Donald Woods. (tlh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Todd Hunter.(McDaniel, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, case number 190906121, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3367014) filed by Todd Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Wright, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Todd Hunter is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Minor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Donald Woods
Represented By: P. Matthew Muir
Represented By: Brady L. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramerica Industries of Idaho
Represented By: Andres Felipe Morelli
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Represented By: Nathan D. Alder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Ruth Pilcher Minor
Represented By: Matthew N. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Hunter
Represented By: Andrew B. McDaniel
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?