Lowe v. CR Bard et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Lowe
Defendant: CR Bard and Bard Peripheral Vascular
Case Number: 2:2019cv00648
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 File Received. Description of error: Filed in the wrong case. The entry has been adjusted by modifying the text that it should be disregarded. (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY ERROR - Disregard, filed in the wrong case. File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Daubert Orders. Main Document - Doc 9428. (Attachments: #1 Doc 9432, #2 Doc 9433, #3 Doc 9434, #4 Doc 9770, #5 Doc 9771, #6 Doc 9772, #7 Doc 9773, #8 Doc 9991, #9 Doc 10051, #10 Doc 10052, #11 Doc 10072, #12 Doc 10230, #13 Doc 10231, #14 Doc 16992, #15 Doc 17285) (rks) Modified by striking text and adding error text on 10/25/2019 (rks).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth C. Helm for Bard Peripheral Vascular, and CR Bard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/26/2019. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth C. Helm , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3380734, filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for PHV - E Helm, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Motion for PHV - E Helm)(Fowler, Tracy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard (Fowler, Tracy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 Modification of Docket: Error: File date of the case was entered incorrectly.. Correction: Corrected the Filing date from 9/11/2019 to 9/12/2019. (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Case Master and Short Form Pleadings. Main Document Dkt 249 - Case Management Order No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 303-2 Master Short Form Complaint for Damages for Individual Claims, #2 Dkt 363 - Case Management Order No. 4, #3 Dkt 364 - Master Complaint for Damages for Individual Claims, #4 Dkt 365 - Case Management Order No. 5, #5 Dkt 366 - Defendants CR Bard and Bard Peripheral Vascular's Answer to Plaintiff's Master Complaint, #6 Dkt 927 - Amended Case Management Order No. 5, #7 Dkt 1108 - Amended Case Management Order No. 4, #8 Dkt 1153-1 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #9 Dkt 1153-2 Defendant Fact Sheet, #10 Dkt 485 - Second Amended Case Management Order No. 4) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Miscellaneous Orders. Main Document Dkt 269. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 8872, #2 Dkt 8874, #3 Dkt 10404, #4 Dkt 10587, #5 Dkt 11321, #6 Dkt 11659, #7 Dkt 11871, #8 Dkt 12007, #9 Dkt 12061, #10 Dkt 12202, #11 Dkt 12589, #12 Dkt 12593, #13 Dkt 12853, #14 Dkt 12971, #15 Dkt 17008, #16 Dkt 18038) (rks) Modified by correcting file date on 9/13/2019 (rks).
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Discovery Orders. Main Document Dkt 249. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 519, #2 Dkt 1259, #3 Dkt 1319, #4 Dkt 1663, #5 Dkt 2238, #6 Dkt 2239, #7 Dkt 3214, #8 Dkt 3272, #9 Dkt 3312, #10 Dkt 3313, #11 Dkt 3314, #12 Dkt 3372, #13 Dkt 3398, #14 Dkt 3685, #15 Dkt 4015, #16 Dkt 4311, #17 Dkt 4335, #18 Dkt 4339, #19 Dkt 4865, #20 Dkt 4866, #21 Dkt 5770, #22 Dkt 5881, #23 Dkt 5883, #24 Dkt 6227, #25 Dkt 6799) (rks) Modified by correcting the file date on 9/13/2019 (rks).
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Discovery and Privilege Orders. Main Document - Dkt 314. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 699, #2 Dkt 2813, #3 Dkt 4865, #4 Dkt 6799, #5 Dkt 8113, #6 Dkt 8315) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Deposition Designation Orders. Main Document - Dkt 10348. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 10403, #2 Dkt 10438, #3 Dkt 10486, #4 Dkt 10497, #5 Dkt 10524, #6 Dkt 10922, #7 Dkt 11064, #8 Dkt 11073, #9 Dkt 11080, #10 Dkt 11313, #11 Dkt 12357, #12 Dkt 12508, #13 Dkt 12590, #14 Dkt 12595, #15 Dkt 12598, #16 Dkt 17386, #17 Dkt 17513, #18 Dkt 17582) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Motions in Limine Orders. Main Document - Dkt 9775. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 9861, #2 Dkt 9881, #3 Dkt 10075, #4 Dkt 10235, #5 Dkt 10258, #6 Dkt 10382, #7 Dkt 10489, #8 Dkt 10819, #9 Dkt 10920, #10 Dkt 10947, #11 Dkt 11041, #12 Dkt 11082, #13 Dkt 11256, #14 Dkt 12507, #15 Dkt 12533, #16 Dkt 17285, #17 Dkt 17401) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Daubert Orders. Main Document - Dkt 9428. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 9432, #2 Dkt 9433, #3 Dkt 9434, #4 Dkt 9770, #5 Dkt 9771, #6 Dkt 9772, #7 Dkt 9773, #8 Dkt 9991, #9 Dkt 10051, #10 Dkt 10052, #11 Dkt 10072, #12 Dkt 10230, #13 Dkt 10231, #14 Dkt 16992, #15 Dkt 17285) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Case Management Orders. Main Document Dkt 248. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 249, #2 Dkt 314, #3 Dkt 363, #4 Dkt 365, #5 Dkt 372, #6 Dkt 401, #7 Dkt 519, #8 Dkt 927, #9 Dkt 1108, #10 Dkt 1259, #11 Dkt 1319, #12 Dkt 1485, #13 Dkt 1662, #14 Dkt 1663, #15 Dkt 2238, #16 Dkt 2239, #17 Dkt 3214, #18 Dkt 3215, #19 Dkt 3372, #20 Dkt 3685, #21 Dkt 4015, #22 Dkt 4016, #23 Dkt 4141, #24 Dkt 4311, #25 Dkt 4335, #26 Dkt 4866, #27 Dkt 5007, #28 Dkt 5285, #29 Dkt 5770, #30 Dkt 5881, #31 Dkt 5883, #32 Dkt 6227, #33 Dkt 6799, #34 Dkt 8113, #35 Dkt 8871, #36 Dkt 9415, #37 Dkt 9775, #38 Dkt 10323, #39 Dkt 11011, #40 Dkt 11320, #41 Dkt 11659, #42 Dkt 11871, #43 Dkt 12061, #44 Dkt 12830, #45 Dkt 12853, #46 Dkt 12971, #47 Dkt 13329, #48 Dkt 15098, #49 Dkt 15176, #50 Dkt 16343, #51 Dkt 17494) (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Richard B. North, Jr., for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ben Martin, Thomas William Arbon, for Plaintiff Matthew Lowe (rks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from USDC of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01618. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Utah via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.] (rks).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.] (rks).
March 9, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01618-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16632092 filed by Matthew Lowe. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. CR Bard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?