Baker v. Comcast Corporation
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00652
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nicole Patel) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Glauberman, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean G. Wieber for Comcast Corporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/27/2019. (las)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott P. Glauberman for Comcast Corporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/27/2019. (las)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean G. Wieber , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3381739, filed by Defendant Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Gehret, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott P. Glauberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3381713, filed by Defendant Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Gehret, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Comcast Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gehret, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/23/2019. (nl)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit A part 2, #4 Return of Service, #5 Notice of Removal) (las)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Comcast Corporation answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/17/2019. (las)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (las)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Notice of Removal,, and Memorandum in Support (To Respond to Complaint) filed by Defendant Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Gehret, Michael) Modified on 9/17/2019 by correcting motion type (las).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Brian Baker and Defendant Comcast Corporation. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190906369, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3372660) filed by Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Served on Defendant, #3 Exhibit 2 - Third District Court Case File, #4 Exhibit 3 - Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal Filed with Third District Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Gehret, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Defendant Comcast Corporation is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Represented By: Brent R. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Gehret
Represented By: Scott Andrew Wiseman
Represented By: Scott P. Glauberman
Represented By: Sean G. Wieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?