Crawmer v. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Crawmer
Defendant: Timothy Dennis, Bruce O. Burnham, Shane Nelson, Darrell Olsen and Devin Blood
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00658
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Mail sent to Joseph W. Crawmer returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - on parole - no forward address. (jwt) Modified on 10/25/2019 correcting filing date(jwt).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph W. Crawmer. (nl)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT COMPLAINTdenying #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/10/2019. (jwt)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Releif (Originally received by the court on 9/16/2019) filed by Plaintiff Joseph W. Crawmer. (nl)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Devin Blood, Bruce O. Burnham, Timothy Dennis, Shane Nelson, Darrell Olsen (Originally received by the court on 9/16/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Joseph W. Crawmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (nl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #11 Exhibit A - complete document with missing page and improved image quality, #12 Exhibit H - copy of document with improved image quality) (jwt).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $120.57. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Collection of Fees) (nl)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants (Original received by the court on 9/16/2019) filed by Plaintiff Joseph W. Crawmer. (nl)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Original received by the court on 9/16/2019) filed by Plaintiff Joseph W. Crawmer. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Partial Filing fee: $ 104.03 received, receipt number 4681087863. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Joseph W. Crawmer received from Correctional Institution. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 9/16/2019) filed by Plaintiff Joseph W. Crawmer. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawmer v. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce O. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Crawmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?