T. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: A. T. and Jennifer T.
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and Plansource Financial Services Inc Healthcare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00664
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company answer due 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/14/2019. (nl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Exend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint) Attorney Todd C. Duffield added to party CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)(Duffield, Todd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jennifer T., A. T. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (King, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/19/2019. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Plansource Financial Services Inc Healthcare Benefit Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3376094) filed by Jennifer T., A. T.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs A. T. and Jennifer T. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd C. Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plansource Financial Services Inc Healthcare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. T.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer T.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?