Christensen v. Johnson Smith & Associates
Plaintiff: Charlotte Christensen
Defendant: Johnson Smith & Associates
Case Number: 2:2019cv00676
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Charlotte Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Default Certificate)(Stephenson, Eric)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins per docket text order 6 . Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case, the pending #5 Motion for Entry of Default, and the inability of defendant to consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge because they have not pled or otherwise defended this case, the undersigned ORDERS this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/12/19. (no attached document)(mjw)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Charlotte Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Default Certificate, #2 Affidavit of Rachel Prickett, #3 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit B-Delivery Details, #5 Exhibit C-Delivery Details)(Stephenson, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Johnson Smith & Associates. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/24/2019. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Johnson Smith & Associates (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3378435) filed by Charlotte Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Christen v. Johnson Smith & Associates) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Stephenson, Eric)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Charlotte Christensen is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Johnson Smith & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Smith & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Christensen
Represented By: Daniel S. Garner
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?