Bacon v. Davis Technical College et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Defendant: FNU Dunford, Steve Gehrke, Davis Technical College, Utah Department of Corrections, Bruce Young, Donovan Starks, Mike Haddon and FNU Powers
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00685
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Reopen Case; denying #10 Motion for Class Certification; denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/08/2019. (kpf)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER WITHDRAWING 11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under under (b)(1)(B) reference. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/7/2019. (cdp)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/5/2019. (cdp)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for certification of class action, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (kpf)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen/Reinstate Case filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED at Plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/15/19. (jmr)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND DISMISSAL ORDER -granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/15/19. (jmr)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to voluntary Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (kpf)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Davis Technical College, FNU Dunford, Steve Gehrke, Mike Haddon, FNU Powers, Donovan Starks, Utah Department of Corrections, Bruce Young (Originally received by the court on 9/23/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (nl)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/08/2019. (nl)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants (Originally received by the court on 9/23/2019) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nl)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 9/23/2019) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 09/23/2019) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Davis Technical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dunford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Technical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?