Dommer v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: David Wayne Dommer
Defendant: Larry Joseph Banks, Rae Ellen Bank and Tom Cook
Case Number: 2:2019cv00708
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER MODIFYING REFERRAL of Magistrate Judge Furse to 28:636 (b)(1)(B) from (b)(1)(A)- Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (mlp)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/30/2019. (las)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against David Wayne Dommer (Originally received by the court on 09/27/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by David Wayne Dommer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/30/2019. (tlh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 09/27/2019) filed by Plaintiff David Wayne Dommer. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dommer v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wayne Dommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Joseph Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Ellen Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?