Clyde v. My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Clyde
Defendant: Brandon Duncan, G&A Partners Utah and My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air
Case Number: 2:2019cv00756
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Matthew Clyde. (nl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #16 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Tipton on behalf of Brandon Duncan, My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air (Tipton, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Nevers, Russell)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Brandon Duncan, My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air. (nl)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Matthew Clyde, Defendants Brandon Duncan, G&A Partners Utah, My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air. Form due by 12/9/2019. (nl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Hymas on behalf of Brandon Duncan, My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air (Hymas, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brandon Duncan, My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air. Attorney Matthew J. Orme added to party Brandon Duncan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Orme added to party My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air(pty:dft)(Orme, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by G&A Partners Utah. Attorney Marcus B. Smith added to party G&A Partners Utah (pty:dft)(Smith, Marcus)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Clyde as to G&A Partners Utah served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Nevers, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Clyde as to Brandon Duncan served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Nevers, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Clyde as to My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Nevers, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 Return of Service, #6 Return of Service, #7 Return of Service. The document Return of Service. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading under Summons Returned Executed. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN - ENTERED IN ERROR **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested served on G&A Partners - Utah, LLC on October 21, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Clyde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Nevers, Russell) Modified on 11/6/2019 stricken, entered under wrong event (nl).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN- ENTERED IN ERROR **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Brandon Duncan on October 24, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Clyde. (Nevers, Russell) Modified on 11/6/2019 stricken, entered under wrong event (nl).
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 STRICKEN - ENTERED IN ERROR **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on My Buddy the Plumber, Heating and Air, LLC on October 24, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Clyde. (Nevers, Russell) Modified on 11/6/2019 stricken-Entered under wrong event (nl).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brandon Duncan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to G&A Partners Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air (tlh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3395138) filed by Matthew Clyde. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Nevers, Russell) Modified on 10/17/2019 by correcting internet payment receipt number (tlh).
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Matthew Clyde is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clyde v. My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Duncan
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Represented By: John V. Tipton
Represented By: Richard M. Hymas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&A Partners Utah
Represented By: Marcus B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Buddy the Plumber Heating and Air
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Represented By: John V. Tipton
Represented By: Richard M. Hymas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Clyde
Represented By: Russell A. Nevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?