Hight v. CR Bard et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Hight
Defendant: CR Bard and Bard Peripheral Vascular
Case Number: 2:2019cv00820
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard (Fowler, Tracy)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/29/2019. (las)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Case Master and Short Form Pleadings. Main Document Dkt 249 (Attachments: #1 Doc 303-2, #2 Doc 363, #3 Doc 364, #4 Doc 365, #5 Doc 366, #6 Doc 927, #7 Doc 1108, #8 Doc 1153-1, #9 Doc 1153-2, #10 Doc 485) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Miscellaneous Orders. Main Document Dkt 269. (Attachments: #1 Doc 8872, #2 Doc 8874, #3 Doc 10404, #4 Doc 10587, #5 Doc 11321, #6 Doc 11659, #7 Doc 11871, #8 Doc 12007, #9 Doc 12061, #10 Doc 12202, #11 Doc 12589, #12 Doc 12593, #13 Doc 12853, #14 Doc 12971, #15 Doc 17008, #16 Doc 18038) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Discovery Orders. Main Document Dkt 249. (Attachments: #1 Doc 519, #2 Doc 1259, #3 Doc 1319, #4 Doc 1663, #5 Doc 2238, #6 Doc 2239, #7 Doc 3214, #8 Doc 3272, #9 Doc 3312, #10 Doc 3313, #11 Doc 3314, #12 Doc 3372, #13 Doc 3398, #14 Doc 3685, #15 Doc 4015, #16 Doc 4311, #17 Doc 4335, #18 Doc 4339, #19 Doc 4865, #20 Doc 4866, #21 Doc 5770, #22 Doc 5881, #23 Doc 5883, #24 Doc 6227, #25 Doc 6799) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Discovery and Privilege Orders. Main Document - Dkt 314. (Attachments: #1 Doc 699, #2 Doc 2813, #3 Doc 4865, #4 Doc 6799, #5 Doc 8113, #6 Doc 8315) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Motions in Limine Orders. Main Document - Dkt 9775. (Attachments: #1 Doc 9861, #2 Doc 9881, #3 Doc 10075, #4 Doc 10235, #5 Doc 10258, #6 Doc 10382, #7 Doc 10489, #8 Doc 10819, #9 Doc 10920, #10 Doc 10947, #11 Doc 11041, #12 Doc 11082, #13 Doc 11256, #14 Doc 12507, #15 Doc 12533, #16 Doc 17285, #17 Doc 17401) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Deposition Designation Orders. Main Document - Dkt 10348. (Attachments: #1 Doc 10403, #2 Doc 10438, #3 Doc 10486, #4 Doc 10497, #5 Doc 10524, #6 Doc 10922, #7 Doc 11064, #8 Doc 11073, #9 Doc 11080, #10 Doc 11313, #11 Doc 12357, #12 Doc 12508, #13 Doc 12590, #14 Doc 12595, #15 Doc 12598, #16 Doc 17386, #17 Doc 17513, #18 Doc 17582) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Daubert Orders. Main Document - Dkt 9428. (Attachments: #1 Doc 9432, #2 Doc 9433, #3 Doc 9434, #4 Doc 9770, #5 Doc 9771, #6 Doc 9772, #7 Doc 9773, #8 Doc 9991, #9 Doc 10051, #10 Doc 10052, #11 Doc 10072, #12 Doc 10230, #13 Doc 10231, #14 Doc 16992, #15 Doc 17285) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 File Received from USDC District of Arizona consisting of MDL Case Management Orders. Main Document Dkt 248. (Attachments: #1 Doc 249, #2 Doc 314, #3 Doc 363, #4 Doc 365, #5 Doc 372, #6 Doc 401, #7 Doc 519, #8 Doc 927, #9 Doc 1108, #10 Doc 1259, #11 Doc 1319, #12 Doc 1485, #13 Doc 1662, #14 Doc 1663, #15 Doc 2238, #16 Doc 2239, #17 Doc 3214, #18 Doc 3215, #19 Doc 3372, #20 Doc 3685, #21 Doc 4015, #22 Doc 4016, #23 Doc 4141, #24 Doc 4311, #25 Doc 4335, #26 Doc 4866, #27 Doc 5007, #28 Doc 5285, #29 Doc 5770, #30 Doc 5881, #31 Doc 5883, #32 Doc 6227, #33 Doc 6799, #34 Doc 8113, #35 Doc 8871, #36 Doc 9415, #37 Doc 9775, #38 Doc 10323, #39 Doc 11011, #40 Doc 11320, #41 Doc 11659, #42 Doc 11871, #43 Doc 12061, #44 Doc 12830, #45 Doc 12853, #46 Doc 12971, #47 Doc 13329, #48 Doc 15098, #49 Doc 15176, #50 Doc 16343, #51 Doc 17494) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Richard B. North, Jr., for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John A. Dalimonte, Paul Lincoln Stoller, for Plaintiff Amanda Hight (Attachments: #1 PHV - Stoller) (rks)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from USDC of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01117. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nelson, Jr.
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the District of Utah via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1117-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16546823 filed by Amanda Hight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hight v. CR Bard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?