Young v. Walmart
Plaintiff: Jody Young
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 2:2019cv00824
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum in Support of leave to Amend the Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #19 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Reply Supporting Motion to Remand. Defendant shall file its surreply on or before 12/30/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/16/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #17 Request to Submit for Decision,Withdrawal of Request and Stipulation to Motion for Leave to File a Surreply filed by Jody Young. (North, Kara)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #18 Notice (Other). The document Notice (Other). The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as Response (NOT to motion) found under "Other Answers & Responses". The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #17 Request to Submit for Decision Withdrawn and Stipulation to Surreply by Defendants by Jody Young. (North, Kara)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Reply Supporting Motion to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 STRICKEN NOTICE of Objection to Plaintiff's Request to Submit Motion to Remand by Walmart re #17 Request to Submit for Decision (Rice, Mitchel) Modified on 12/16/2019 stricken, wrong event selected, counsel to refile (nl).
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Jody Young. (North, Kara)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum in Support of leave to Amend the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jody Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(North, Kara)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to Seventh Judicial District Court and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jody Young. (North, Kara)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to Seventh Judicial District Court and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to Seventh Judicial District Court and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jody Young. (North, Kara)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Motions due by 3/22/2021. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/19/2019. (nl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Walmart, Plaintiff Jody Young. (nl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jody Young. (nl)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/29/2019. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 7th District, Carbon County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Summons) (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Walmart, Plaintiff Jody Young. Form due by 11/12/2019. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Walmart, Plaintiff Jody Young. (nl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial District Court, Carbon County, case number 190700094, No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Rice, Mitchel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Young
Represented By: Kara H. North
Represented By: Randall K. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?