Clayroll v. Prodigy Promos et al
Plaintiff: Clayroll
Defendant: Tyler Fredrickson, Brooke Johns, Michael Perley, Jason Marsh, Jeffrey Johns, Henhouse Designworks, Prodigy Promos and John Priday
Case Number: 2:2019cv00873
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #12 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Notice of Removal, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff to file its Amended Complaint and otherwise respond to Defendants Motions to Dismiss is extended to January 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/26/2019. (nl)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Clayroll. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sumsion, Grant) Modified on 12/26/2019 Added event Motion for Extension of Time to Amend and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss (nl).
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Henhouse Designworks, Brooke Johns, Jeffrey Johns. (las)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (las)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Clayroll, Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Henhouse Designworks, Brooke Johns, Jeffrey Johns, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. Form due by 12/20/2019. (las)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Henhouse Designworks, Brooke Johns, Jeffrey Johns. Attorney Andrew V. Collins added to party Henhouse Designworks(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew V. Collins added to party Brooke Johns(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew V. Collins added to party Jeffrey Johns(pty:dft)(Collins, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (Lee, Joshua)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Tyler Fredrickson answer due 12/4/2019; Jason Marsh answer due 12/4/2019; Michael Perley answer due 12/4/2019; John Priday answer due 12/4/2019; Prodigy Promos answer due 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 19-873. (nl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joshua)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING without prejudice #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/13/2019. No attached document. (nas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 4th District Court - Utah County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Order of Transfer, #3 Returned Summons re Brooke Johns, #4 Returned Summons re Henhouse Designworks, #5 Returned Summons re Jason Marsh, #6 Returned Summons re Jeffrey Johns, #7 Returned Summons re John Priday, #8 Returned Summons re Michael Perley, #9 Returned Summons re Prodigy Promotions, #10 Returned Summons re Tyler Fredrickson, #11 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/08/2019. (nl)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Clayroll and Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (tlh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth District Court, Utah County, case number 190300167, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3414352) filed by John Priday, Tyler Fredrickson, Michael Perley, Prodigy Promos, Jason Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Returns of Service) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Lee, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Michael Perley, John Priday and Prodigy Promos are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayroll v. Prodigy Promos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Fredrickson
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Johns
Represented By: Andrew V. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perley
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Marsh
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Johns
Represented By: Andrew V. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henhouse Designworks
Represented By: Andrew V. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Promos
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Priday
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayroll
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?