Smith v. Clerks Office et al
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Clerks Office and USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00937
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 1/14/2020. (las)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Clerks Office (Originally received by the court on 11/21/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/13/2019. (tlh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SECOND MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 11/21/2019) filed by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's letter for additional information)(tlh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 11/21/2019) filed by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Clerks Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerks Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?