Craig v. Rich et al
Plaintiff: Elrachio Naguan Craig
Defendant: FNU Baker, FNU Wright and FNU Rich
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00940
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $4.84. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 12/18/2019. (las)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Certificate regarding Inmate Account re #7 Sealed Document - Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Elrachio Naguan Craig. (kpf)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Elrachio Naguan Craig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(kpf)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Elrachio Naguan Craig. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against FNU Baker, FNU Rich, FNU Wright (Originally received by the court on 11/22/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Elrachio Naguan Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - redacted and filed in #2 , #3 SEALED Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/03/2019. (tlh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Elrachio Naguan Craig. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Appointment of Counsel)(tlh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Elrachio Naguan Craig received from Correctional Institution (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Envelope) (kpf).
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Elrachio Naguan Craig received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 11/22/2019) filed by Plaintiff Elrachio Naguan Craig. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Waive Fees)(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Rich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elrachio Naguan Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?