Tucker et al v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: T. Greg Tucker and Debra Tucker
Defendant: Kendra McPherson, Sierra Bonita Elementary School, Garret Anderson and Nebo School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00944
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 12/17/2019. (las)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Debra Tucker, and T. Greg Tucker. (nl)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Garret Anderson answer due 1/31/2020; Kendra McPherson answer due 1/31/2020; Nebo School District answer due 1/31/2020; Sierra Bonita Elementary School answer due 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/12/2019. (nl)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Garret Anderson, Kendra McPherson, Nebo School District, Sierra Bonita Elementary School. (nl)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Garret Anderson, Kendra McPherson, Nebo School District, Sierra Bonita Elementary School. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terry, Rachel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from 4th District Court - Provo County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 State Proposed Order, #4 State Order to Change Venue) (nl)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/26/2019. (nl)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Garret Anderson, Kendra McPherson, Nebo School District, Sierra Bonita Elementary School, Plaintiffs Debra Tucker, T. Greg Tucker. Form due by 12/11/2019. (nl)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Garret Anderson, Kendra McPherson, Nebo School District, Sierra Bonita Elementary School, Plaintiffs Debra Tucker, T. Greg Tucker. (nl)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Judicial District Court, Utah County, case number 190401676, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3428358) filed by Kendra McPherson, Sierra Bonita Elementary School, Nebo School District, Garret Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Terry, Rachel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendants Garret Anderson, Kendra McPherson, Nebo School District, Sierra Bonita Elementary School is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra McPherson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Adam D. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Bonita Elementary School
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Adam D. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Adam D. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebo School District
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Adam D. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Greg Tucker
Represented By: Tad D. Draper
Represented By: Troy K. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Tucker
Represented By: Tad D. Draper
Represented By: Troy K. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?