Redmond v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Plaintiff: John Redmond
Defendant: Rosie Rivera, FNU Gaerte, Medical Dept, Classification Dept and Salt Lake County Jail
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv01008
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Pleading called Retaliation. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Clerk re: Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office Corrections Bureau - Request Slips. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Prisoner Letter re: Grama request for certified copy. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Redmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope, #4 Cover Letter)(kpf)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Classification Dept, FNU Gaerte, Medical Dept, Rosie Rivera, Salt Lake County Jail (Originally received by the court on 12/30/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by John Redmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Civil Cover Sheet, #38 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 01/08/2020. (tlh)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 12/30/2019) filed by Plaintiff John Redmond. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gaerte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?