Gardner v. Defendant Placeholder
Plaintiff: Edson Gardner
Defendant: Defendant Placeholder
Case Number: 2:2019rf00559
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Case Number 19-4122 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Edson Gardner. (jmr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re #5 Notice of Appeal as to 10th Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(jwt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Plaintiff has been placed on the Court's Restricted Filer List pursuant to the order entered by Judge David Nuffer on 03/23/2015 in Case 2:15mc00047. The proposed appeal has been attached to this entry and the originals forwarded to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review and possible submission to the Chief District Judge before filing.Note - This RF case number is a placeholder case only and will become an active Civil (CV) case for service and litigation upon order of this court. (tlh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Case Review Order filed by Edson Gardner. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: Not Paid. Filing fee $ 505. (jwt)
August 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT Originals of the proposed Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and other documents are returned to the plaintiff per the Restricted Filer Case Review re #2 Case Review Order. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE REVIEW ORDER The clerk is instructed to return the filing to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 08/12/2019. (tlh)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Plaintiff has been placed on the Court's Restricted Filer List pursuant to the order entered by Judge David Nuffer on 3/23/2015 in Case 2:15mc00047 DN. The proposed complaint and accompanying documentation have been attached to this entry and the originals forwarded to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review and possible submission to the Chief District Judge before filing.Note - This RF case number is a placeholder case only and will become an active Civil (CV) case for service and litigation upon order of this court. (tlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Corrected submitted documents) (tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Defendant Placeholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edson Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Placeholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?