Whitney v. TA Operating
Plaintiff: Pamela Whitney
Defendant: TA Operating
Case Number: 2:2020cv00135
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for TA Operating answer due 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/23/2020. (las)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Pamela Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Crane, Matthew)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for TA Operating answer due 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/20/2020. (las)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant TA Operating. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Attorney Monica S. Call added to party TA Operating(pty:dft)(Call, Monica)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/5/2020. (nl)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 3/4/2020. (las)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Whitney as to TA Operating served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Crane, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to TA Operating. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against TA Operating (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3506074) filed by Pamela Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Crane, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Pamela Whitney is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. TA Operating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Whitney
Represented By: Matthew B. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating
Represented By: Monica S. Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?