P. v. Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Christopher P.
Defendant: Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois and Boeing Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv00168
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Northern District of Illinois via Electronic Transfer given case number 1:20-cv-02795. (nl)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of Illinois. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Northern District of Illinois District Court. Case closed. (nl)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/7/2020. (nl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Christopher P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(King, Brian)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois answer due 6/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/5/2020. (nl)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 5/4/2020. (lnp)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher P. as to Boeing Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The Waiver sent on 3/16/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (King, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher P. as to Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois Waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (King, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois, Boeing Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The. filed by Christopher P.. (King, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a discovery schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one(21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/19/2020. (las)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 3/17/2020. (las)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois, Boeing Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3520432) filed by Christopher P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (King, Brian)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Christopher P. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. v. Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecross Blueshield of Illinois
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher P.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?