Park City Group Inc. et al v. Shearers Foods
Plaintiff: Park City Group Inc. and Repositrak
Defendant: Shearers Foods
Case Number: 2:2020cv00171
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. It is Ordered that all current deadlines in this case, including the pending deadlines to file a jointly signed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and stipulated Proposed Scheduling Order and to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by April 14, 2020, are extended for a period of sixty (60) days, to June 15, 2020. If settlement negotiations are not successful, the parties shall submit a stipulated, proposed scheduling order no later than the June 15, 2020 date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/1/2020. (las)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Current Deadlines and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Park City Group Inc., Repositrak. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Petersen, Lisa)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 3/24/2020. (las)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Park City Group Inc., Repositrak. (nl) Modified on 3/23/2020 to correct the file date(nl).
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Shearers Foods. (Vamianakis, Artemis)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/17/2020. (nl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Shearers Foods. (nl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Limited Appearance of Counsel, #3 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Park City Group Inc., Repositrak, Defendant Shearers Foods. Form due by 3/30/2020. (nl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Park City Group Inc., Repositrak, Defendant Shearers Foods. (nl)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200900912, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3520655) filed by Shearers Foods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Executed Declaration of George Hawk, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Vamianakis, Artemis)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant Shearers Foods is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park City Group Inc. et al v. Shearers Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park City Group Inc.
Represented By: Lisa R. Petersen
Represented By: Caitlin E. McKelvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Repositrak
Represented By: Lisa R. Petersen
Represented By: Caitlin E. McKelvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shearers Foods
Represented By: Artemis D. Vamianakis
Represented By: Jason W. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?