Bona v. Lincoln National Corporation
Plaintiff: Caprice Bona
Defendant: Lincoln National Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00199
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:20cv199-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (dla)
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #12 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lincoln National Corporation.(Baker, Neil)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Lincoln National Corporation. (alf)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Caprice Bona, Defendant Lincoln National Corporation. Form due by 5/13/2020. (nl)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Darren E. Nadel for Lincoln National Corporation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/23/2020. (nl)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen E. Baumann II for Lincoln National Corporation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/23/2020. (nl)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darren E. Nadel , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3554290,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Lincoln National Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Neil)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen E. Baumann II , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3554272,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Lincoln National Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Neil)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Lincoln National Corporation answer due 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/20/2020. (nl)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Lincoln National Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1) Attorney Neil C. Baker added to party Lincoln National Corporation(pty:dft)(Baker, Neil)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caprice Bona as to Lincoln National Corporation served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Ford, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/30/2020. (nl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lincoln National Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Corporation (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3531325) filed by Caprice Bona. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Ford, Adam)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Caprice Bona is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bona v. Lincoln National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Corporation
Represented By: Neil C. Baker
Represented By: Stephen E. Baumann, II
Represented By: Darren E. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caprice Bona
Represented By: Adam D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?