Velasquez v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Velasquez
Defendant: State of Utah, Utah Division of Aging and Adult Services/APS, Utah Department of Human Services, Utah Office of Administrative Hearings, Nels Holmgren, Sean Reyes, State of Utah Legislature, The, J. Stephen Mikita, Office of Legislative Research and General Counsel, US Administration of Community Living, Amanda Slater, Laura Thompson, Sonia Sweeney, Gary R. Herbert and Thomas R Vaughn
Case Number: 2:2020cv00205
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Velasquez re #20 MOTION to Set Aside (jwt)
May 15, 2020 Filing 22 Modification of Docket: re #20 MOTION to Set Aside edited to reflect addition of Motion to Recuse Judge Dee Benson, #21 edited to change name of document to Affidavit in Support of #20 Motion to Recuse Judge Dee Benson, motion terminated. (dla)
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #20 Motion to Recuse Judge Dee Benson filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez. (dla) Modified by editing docket text to change name of document to Affidavit in Support of Motion to Recuse on 5/15/2020 (dla).
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION "to Set Aside for Fraud on the Court", Motion to Recuse Judge Dee Benson, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to the Clerk at Filing) (dla) Modified by editing docket text to add Motion to Recuse on 5/15/2020 (dla).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under the authority of the IFP Statute. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/24/2020. (jds)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER : All of Plaintiff's motions are MOOT - #2 Motion, #9 Motion, #11 Motion. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under the authority of the IFPStatute. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/24/2020. (jds)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Velasquez NOTE: email filing is provisionally allowed during the current pandemic crisis and will only continue with an order by the assigned judge once the court returns to normal operations. (jds)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Department of Human Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Department of Human Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State of Utah Legislature, The. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Department of Human Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 Modification of Docket: Error: Parties not added at case opening. Correction: Parties added per complaint pages xii and xiii. re #4 Complaint. (jl)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Reassignment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jds)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/8/2020. (reb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Summons and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez.NOTE: email filing is provisionally allowed during the current pandemic crisis and will only continue with an order by the assigned judge once the court returns to normal operations. In addition: filer listed the incorrect case number on the filing. (jds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Office of Administrative Hearings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Division of Aging and Adult Services/APS. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against State of Utah, Utah Department of Human Services, Utah Division of Aging and Adult Services/APS, Utah Office of Administrative Hearings (Originally received by the court on 3/26/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Carlos Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Supplement False Statement, #7 Supplement Discovery Background, #8 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (nl)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/3/2020. (nl)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Electronic Service Request filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez. (dla)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 3/26/2020) filed by Plaintiff Carlos Velasquez. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Division of Aging and Adult Services/APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Office of Administrative Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nels Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah Legislature, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stephen Mikita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Legislative Research and General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Administration of Community Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?