Meneses et al v. Salander Enterprises
Plaintiff: Daniel Lowrance, Rodney Hill, Samir Meneses and Alissa Blake
Defendant: Salander Enterprises
Case Number: 2:2020cv00230
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/1/2020. (nl)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION MOTION to Remand to State Court by Salander Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanus, David) Modified on 5/1/2020 to correct event Motion to Remand to State Court (nl).
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Salander Enterprises. (nl)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #3 ) filed by Salander Enterprises. (Hanus, David)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Hanus for Salander Enterprises.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/7/2020. (nl)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Hanus , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3540165,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Salander Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Constantino, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Appearance, #3 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Alissa Blake, Rodney Hill, Daniel Lowrance, Samir Meneses, Defendant Salander Enterprises. Form due by 4/21/2020. (kn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200901992, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3539620) filed by Salander Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Constantino, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Alissa Blake, Rodney Hill, Daniel Lowrance, Samir Meneses, Defendant Salander Enterprises. (kn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Salander Enterprises is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meneses et al v. Salander Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lowrance
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hill
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Meneses
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Blake
Represented By: Tyler B. Ayres
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salander Enterprises
Represented By: Gregory M. Constantino
Represented By: David J. Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?