Mahdi v. Salt Lake Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Thaer Mahdi
Defendant: Utah Highway Patrol, Unified Police Department, Salt Lake Police Department, Jed Miller, Michael Rapich, Jon Thompson and Chris Shelby
Case Number: 2:2020cv00250
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thaer Mahdi as to Jed Miller Waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; Michael Rapich Waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; Chris Shelby Waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; Jon Thompson Waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Garrett, Aaron)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Mary E. Dewey filed by Mary E. Dewey on behalf of Thaer Mahdi (Dewey, Mary)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Rapich. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jon Thompson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jed Miller. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chris Shelby. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Salt Lake Police Department, Unified Police Department with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Michael Rapich; Jed Miller; Jon Thompson; Chris Shelby; John Does 1-10. Removed Defendants: Utah Highway Patrol. filed by Thaer Mahdi. (Dewey, Mary)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/21/2020. (las)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thaer Mahdi as to Salt Lake Police Department Waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Garrett, Aaron)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thaer Mahdi as to Unified Police Department Waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Garrett, Aaron)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thaer Mahdi as to Utah Highway Patrol served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 1 - Utah Highway Patrol Summons)(Garrett, Aaron)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 4/20/2020. (las)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 4/17/2020. (las)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unified Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Highway Patrol. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3548097) filed by Thaer Mahdi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1 - Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Garrett, Aaron)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Thaer Mahdi is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahdi v. Salt Lake Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rapich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaer Mahdi
Represented By: Nathan R. Garcia
Represented By: Aaron C. Garrett
Represented By: Mary E. Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?