Burningham v. Herbert et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Burningham
Defendant: Gary Herbert and Spencer Cox
Case Number: 2:2020cv00286
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (dla)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jeff Burningham (Hayman, Cheylynn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance F. Sorenson on behalf of Spencer Cox, Gary Herbert (Sorenson, Lance)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Wolf on behalf of Spencer Cox, Gary Herbert (Wolf, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2020 re: docket entry #6 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Jeff Burningham. The court heard oral arugment and for the reasons stated on the record, the court DENIED as futile docket entry #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jeff Burningham. Terminating docket entry #8 Motion to Expedite; #8 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING REGARDING (1) MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO JUDGE ROBERT J. SHELBY AND Written Order to follow oral order: No. Attorney for Plaintiff: Cheylynn Hayman, Attorney for Defendant Lance Sorenson, David Wolf. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(mjm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Telephone Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 4:00 PM (MST) before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Judge Robert J. Shelby has set a telephone conference for 5/1/2020 AT 4:00 pm (MST). As a participant, the conference instructions are as follows: 1. Dial 888-808-6929 ; 2. Enter Access Code 2900331 ; 3. To enter as a participant, press # key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. If you have any questions before the hearing begins, please do not hesitate to call chambers at 801-524-6790, if you are having issues during the hearing, please email the case administrator at mary_jane_mcnamee@utd.uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (mjm)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Reassign Case. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Judge Dee Benson no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:20-cv-286-RJS. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/30/2020. No attached document. (jds)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Hafen on behalf of Jeff Burningham (Hafen, Jonathan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING AND HEARING REGARDING (1) MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO JUDGE ROBERT J. SHELBY AND (2) MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Jeff Burningham. (Hayman, Cheylynn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Reassign Case TO JUDGE ROBERT J. SHELBY filed by Plaintiff Jeff Burningham. (Hayman, Cheylynn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jeff Burningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jeff Burningham Declaration)(Hayman, Cheylynn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeff Burningham re #2 Complaint, (Hayman, Cheylynn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gary Herbert. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Spencer Cox. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE, DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3561654) filed by Jeff Burningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Hayman, Cheylynn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiff Jeff Burningham is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burningham v. Herbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Burningham
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Cheylynn Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Herbert
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Cox
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?