Byron v. University of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Robert Byron
Defendant: Lori McDonald, Ruth Wakins, University of Utah and Ruth Watkins
Case Number: 2:2020cv00290
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying #42 Motion to Amend/Correct/Leave to file Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/20/21. (alf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support . Responses due by 9/22/2021. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/19/2021. (reb)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Motions No Longer Referred: #65 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support . District Judge will rule on motion. (ep)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Byron re #58 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Byron . (Egan, Austin)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/05/2021. (jl)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Motions No Longer Referred: #60 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. District judge will address motion. (ep)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #60 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support , #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth WatkinsNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-OEO Report, #2 Exhibit 4-Byron's Response to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 8-Committee Report, #4 Exhibit 10-Rationale Memo, #5 Exhibit 13-McDonald's Decision, #6 Exhibit 16-Byron's Appeal to President Watkins, #7 Exhibit 17-Watkins' Decision)(Terry, Rachel)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Terry, Rachel)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - University Policy 1-012 and University Rule 1-012, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ex 2 - University Rule 1-012B and University Procedure 1-012, #4 Exhibit 3 - OEO Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bryron's Response to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Brian Burton, #7 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Sanctions, #8 Exhibit 7 - December 27, 2019 Emails, #9 Exhibit 8 - Committee Report, #10 Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Ruth Watkins, #11 Exhibit 10 - Rationale Memo, #12 Exhibit 11 - ATIXA Guide, #13 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Lori McDonald, #14 Exhibit Ex 13 - McDonald's Decision, #15 Exhibit 14 - Defendants' Discovery Responses, #16 Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Lori McDonald, #17 Exhibit 16 - Byron's Appeal to President Watkins, #18 Exhibit 17 - Watkins' Decision, #19 Exhibit 18 - Deposition of Robert Byron, #20 Exhibit 19 - University Policy 6-400)(Terry, Rachel)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Scheduling conference set at #50 for 8/12/2021 at 2:45 p.m. is terminated pending resolution of the dispositive motion at #48 and any other dispositive motions filed by the deadline. The court will reset a scheduling conference to set a trial date if needed upon resolution of dispositive motions. (tcs)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Terry, Rachel)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in support re #48 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support. Replies due by 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 05/28/2021. (jl)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Motions No Longer Referred: #48 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support , #54 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum in Support The District Judge will address the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (rep)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Terry, Rachel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #48 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Egan, Austin)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #42 Defendant's Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Egan, Austin) Modified by striking defendant from text as the motion is the Plaintiff's on 5/12/2021 (jl).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 Defendant's Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Egan, Austin) Modified by striking defendant from text as it is the Plaintiff's motion on 5/12/2021 (jl).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 7/23/2021. Motions due by 8/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. See order for other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 05/06/2021. (jl)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Third Amended Scheduling Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Terry, Rachel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 Defendant's Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Terry, Rachel) Modified by clarifying #42 is plaintiff's motion, not defendant's motion on 4/30/2021 (jl).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #45 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Defendants may file an opposition that is five pages overlength. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/28/2021. No attached document. (eh)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Terry, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #43 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The deadline is extended to April 28, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/26/2021. No attached document. (eh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Opposition in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Terry, Rachel)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redline Version of Amended Complaint) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #40 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 6/23/2021. Motions due by 7/20/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/3/21. (jrj)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Second Amended Scheduling Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Status conference set for 4/1/2021 is terminated because it has been replaced by a scheduling conference on 6/17/2021 in the event no dispositive motions are filed by 6/11/2021. (tcs)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - granting #38 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 6/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/5/21. (jrj)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Egan, Austin)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/18/2021. Motions due by 3/26/2021. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 02:45 AM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 08/03/2020. (kpf)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Egan, Austin)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by University of Utah.(Terry, Rachel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ruth Wakins.(Terry, Rachel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lori McDonald.(Terry, Rachel)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/8/20. (jrj)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 7/7/2020.(sds)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline updated for Lori McDonald answer due 7/20/2020; University of Utah answer due 7/20/2020; Ruth Wakins answer due 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 7/1/20. (jrj)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terry, Rachel)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #9 Motion for TRO and #17 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/24/20. (jrj)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Barlow: Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2020 re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Byron, #17 *SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Byron. The court conducted the hearing telephonically. Discussion and argument heard on the motion. For the reasons stated on the record, the court DENIED the motion. A written order will follow. Attorney for Plaintiff: Austin Egan, Attorney for Defendant: Rachel Terry. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(tcs)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #17 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, and #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : (Notice generated by DBB Chambers). Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge David Barlow. The purpose of the hearing is to allow attorney argument only, limited to 30 minutes per side. Call-in instructions will be sent to counsel prior to the hearing.(sds)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #17 *SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Egan, Austin)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 *SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Reply Declaration of R. Byron, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - OEO Retaliation Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Byron's Response to Retaliation Complaint)(Egan, Austin)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File file an overlength reply1 in support of the motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/9/20. (jrj)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 *SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support, #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1-Declaration of Brian Burton, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Proposed Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Ex 3-Emails Sending Proposed Sanctions, #4 Exhibit Ex 4-Sanctions Rationale Memo, #5 Exhibit Ex 5-Declaration of Lori McDonald)(Terry, Rachel)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file their response to the motion for temporary restraining order on or before June 4, 2020. Plaintiff must file his reply on or before June 11, 2020. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/2/20. (jrj)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 9) and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins. (Terry, Rachel)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terry, Rachel)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *SEALED DOCUMENT*Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of R. Byron, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Course Grades, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Documents Filed with Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Byron's Response to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Letter from W. Bugden, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OEO Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - University Rule 1-012B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - University Rule 1-012, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Notice of Hearing, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Byron's Pre-Hearing Disclosures, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Complainant's Pre-Hearing Disclosures, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Committee Final Report, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Letter from VP McDonald, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Appeal to President, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Letter from Dr. Brown, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Letter from S. Derzon, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Letter from President Watkins)(Egan, Austin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL - Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/26/20. Plaintiff may file his motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction under seal in accordance with DUCivR 5-3.(jrj)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #10 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed d*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed d filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Egan, Austin)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff Robert Byron's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins re #10 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed d*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed d (Terry, Rachel)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 9) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER establishing an expedited briefing schedule regarding Plaintiff's motion #10 for leave to file under seal a motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Defendants shall file a response on or before May 28, 2020. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before June 1, 2020. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/20/2020.(sds)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERLENGTH MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - granting #8 Motion for Leave to File. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/20/20. (jrj)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re #9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties) filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, redacted information highlighted, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of R. Byron (redacted), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Course Grades, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Complaint (redacted), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Documents Filed with Complaint (redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Byron's Response to Complaint (redacted), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Letter from W. Bugden (redacted), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OEO Report (redacted), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - University Rule 1-012B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - University Rule 1-012, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Notice of Hearing, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Byron's Pre-Hearing Disclosures, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Complainant's Pre-Hearing Disclosures, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Committee Final Report (redacted), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Letter from Vice President, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Appeal to President (redacted), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Letter from Dr. Brown, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Letter from S. Derzon, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Letter from President Watkins (redacted))(Egan, Austin)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Byron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel G. Terry on behalf of Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins (Terry, Rachel)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Byron as to Lori McDonald Waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Egan, Austin)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Byron as to Ruth Wakins Waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Egan, Austin)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Byron as to University of Utah Waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Egan, Austin)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by Robert Byron re #2 Complaint. (Egan, Austin)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lori McDonald, University of Utah, Ruth Wakins (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BUTDC-3562604) filed by Robert Byron. Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Egan, Austin)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff Robert Byron is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byron v. University of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori McDonald
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Wakins
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Watkins
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Byron
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Represented By: Andrew W. Stavros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?