Morgan et al v. Morgan
Appellant: Brent Morgan and Summit Development and Lending Group
Not Classified By Court: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Appellee: Troy Morgan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00291
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING of Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group. (Christiansen, Stephen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Amended Statement of Interested Parties and Oral Argument by Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group (Christiansen, Stephen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of AMENDED APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 10-26708. No filing fee required. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Briefs and other subsequent documents filed with the court should contain references to bankruptcy documents using document numbers and dates. filed by Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order 4/16/2020, #2 Bankruptcy Order 6/14/2020) (rks)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Statement of Interested Parties and Statement Regarding Oral Argument by Troy Morgan (Howe, Craig)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig H. Howe on behalf of Troy Morgan (Howe, Craig)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake D. Miller on behalf of Troy Morgan (Miller, Blake)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Statement of Interested Parties and Oral Argument by Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group (Christiansen, Stephen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen K. Christiansen on behalf of Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group (Christiansen, Stephen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: The incorrect document was attached to the Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal. Correction: The docket text has been stricken and the correct document has been filed. re #2 Notice to Counsel re Bankruptcy Appeal,. (tlh)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal, e-mailed or mailed to Notice Party Bankruptcy Clerk's Office, Appellants Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group, Appellee Troy Morgan. (tlh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY ERROR Notice to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal, e-mailed or mailed to Notice Party Bankruptcy Clerk's Office, Appellants Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group, Appellee Troy Morgan. (tlh) Modified on 5/1/2020 by striking text. Wrong document attached for Notice. (tlh).
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 10-26708. No filing fee required. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Briefs and other subsequent documents filed with the court should contain references to bankruptcy documents using document numbers and dates. filed by Brent Morgan, Summit Development and Lending Group. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket report) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brent Morgan
Represented By: Stephen K. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Summit Development and Lending Group
Represented By: Stephen K. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Troy Morgan
Represented By: Blake D. Miller
Represented By: Craig H. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?