Askee v. Petco Animal Supplies Stores
Plaintiff: Wendy Askee
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores
Case Number: 2:2020cv00296
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Snow, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, case reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores. (alf)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney C. Christine Burns for Petco Animal Supplies Stores.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/8/20. (alf)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores identifying Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Holdings, Inc. LLC, PET Acquisition, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Barton, David)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Petco Animal Supplies Stores.(Barton, David)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Wendy Askee. (alf)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Wendy Askee, Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores. Form due by 6/10/2020. (alf)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Christine Burns , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3586150,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney David T. Barton added to party Petco Animal Supplies Stores(pty:dft)(Barton, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Askee as to Petco Animal Supplies Stores served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Snow, Christopher)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/6/20. (alf)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Petco Animal Supplies Stores. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Petco Animal Supplies Stores (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3566324) filed by Wendy Askee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Snow, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Wendy Askee is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Askee v. Petco Animal Supplies Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores
Represented By: C. Christine Burns
Represented By: David T. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Askee
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?