Yalanis v. Polarityte
Plaintiff: Georgia Yalanis
Defendant: Polarityte
Case Number: 2:2020cv00302
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. Defendant's Answer is due fourteen (14) days after the date the Amended Complaint is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/22/2020. (lnp)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Droubay, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2020 by changing the event type (lnp).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Defendants' response is due on or before June 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/12/2020. (lnp)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Polarityte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Christopher W. Droubay added to party Polarityte(pty:dft)(Droubay, Christopher) Modified on 6/12/2020 by changing the event and linking the motion to the complaint (lnp).
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Polarityte. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/18/2020. (lnp)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 5/8/2020. (lnp)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Polarityte (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3569429) filed by Georgia Yalanis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Stavros, Andrew)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Georgia Yalanis is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yalanis v. Polarityte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Yalanis
Represented By: Andrew W. Stavros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polarityte
Represented By: Christopher W. Droubay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?