Al Delfi v. Saul
Plaintiff: Khaldia Al Delfi
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 2:2020cv00324
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to file Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/16/20. (alf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Attorney Christina J. Valerio added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft)(Valerio, Christina)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (alf)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Khaldia Al Delfi, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Form due by 7/30/2020. (alf)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Berndt, Amanda)
June 7, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Khaldia Al Delfi. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Reichardt, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:20-cv-00324-JCB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (rks)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3581922) filed by Khaldia Al Delfi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet SSI Claim) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Reichardt, Andrew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Khaldia Al Delfi is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Delfi v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaldia Al Delfi
Represented By: Andrew J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?