Smith v. Hadden et al
Plaintiff: Adam Joshua Smith
Defendant: Mike Hadden, FNU Olsen, FNU Power, FNU Kristy and FNU Camble
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00451
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 07/06/2020. (kpf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Adam Joshua Smith received from Correctional Institution (jl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against FNU Camble, Mike Hadden, FNU Kristy, FNU Olsen, FNU Power (Originally received by the court on 06/24/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Adam Joshua Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (jl)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/30/2020. (jl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Adam Joshua Smith. (jl)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/24/2020) filed by Plaintiff Adam Joshua Smith. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hadden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Kristy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Camble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Joshua Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?