Redmond v. Rivera
Petitioner: John Redmond
Respondent: Rosie Rivera
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00465
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner John Redmond. (kpf)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Account Balance Statements filed by Petitioner John Redmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner John Redmond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1)(jl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, under 28 U.S.C. 2241 Fee Status: IFP. (Originally received on 06/25/2020) filed by John Redmond. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (jl)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: Waived. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/13/2020. (jl)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: It is therefore ordered that within THIRTY DAYS Petitioner must file a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that the petitioner has in any account in the institution. If Petitioner does not fully comply, this case will be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/07/2020. (kpf)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner John Redmond. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 6/25/2020) (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosie Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?