O'Shaughnessy v. Young Living Essential Oils, LC et al
Plaintiff: Julie O'Shaughnessy
Defendant: Jared Turner, Benjamin Riley, Mary Young, The Young Living Foundation, Inc. and Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00470
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Katrina Gallaher Eash and Thomas M. Melsheimer, for Defendants Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (nl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr., for Defendants Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (nl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. David Rowe, for Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (nl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert Eric Linkin, for Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (nl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Austin Tighe, for Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (nl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 75 Case transferred in from USDC of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00412. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING #42 Defendants' Motion to Transfer; ORDER this cause is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Utah, Northern Division. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #72 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines Related to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response DUE 7/10/20; Defendants' Reply DUE 7/24/20 Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue by Jared Turner, Mary Young. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 4/30/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2021, Class Certification Hearing set for 5/3/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 5/26/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Enter Amended Scheduling Order by Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER LIFTING STAY and SETTING Telephone Conference for 5/26/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 65 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT issued as the MANDATE affirming the judgment of the District Court. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE Regarding Action Taken By The Circuit by Julie O'Shaughnessy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay filed December 23, 2019 (Doc. #41 ) isGRANTED TO THE FOLLOWING EXTENT: this case is STAYED pending further order ofthe court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #43 Motion to Dismiss ; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jared Turner answer due 2/7/2020; Mary Young answer due 2/7/2020; Young Living Essential Oils, LC answer due 2/7/2020. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File to Answer. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC amending #1 Complaint., filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy.(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC, re #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC, re #41 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 1/13/2020 to correct file date (td). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Order and Briefing Schedule from Fifth Circuit by Julie O'Shaughnessy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Motion to Expedite Appeal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Expedited Briefing Schedule)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #41 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC for dates of N/A. Proceedings Transcribed: N/A. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez.. (Eash, Katrina) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's #41 Motion to Stay until 01/06/20. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' #42 Motion to Dismiss until 01/06/20. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) Modified on 12/30/2019 to correct motion link (klw). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss - 12(b)(6) and 9(b), #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue, #44 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Transfer Case by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Stay Case by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss - 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Transfer Case by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Case by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #39 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), #33 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations,, Terminate Motions, by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-12990412. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #33 by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-12990412) (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/17/2020, Class Certification Hearing set for 7/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020, Class Certification Discovery due by 6/5/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2020, Motions due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint; Defendants' answers due 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Proposed Scheduling Order by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) Modified on 12/6/2019 (lt). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING Defendants' #23 Motion to Limit Pre-Certification Discovery. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING #29 Report and Recommendations. ORDER DENYING #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. ORDER DENYING #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Mary Young, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Riley, Jared Turner. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/26/2019. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #30 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION to #29 Report and Recommendations by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Motion to Compel, filed by Mary Young, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Riley, Jared Turner, #7 Motion to Compel, filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC, re #23 MOTION for Discovery to be Limited Prior to Certification filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 11/26/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #23 MOTION for Discovery to be Limited Prior to Certification filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Limit Pre-Certification Discovery. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION for Discovery to be Limited Prior to Certification by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Linkin, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Discovery to be Limited Prior to Certification by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Amended Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Bifurcated Scheduling Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Filed Jointly by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Amended Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Bifurcated Scheduling Order, #3 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Non-Bifurcated Scheduling Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order; DENYING #15 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Meet and Confer and Submit Joint Report Under Rule 26 filed by Mary Young, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Benjamin Riley, Jared Turner.(Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/30/2019). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC, re #15 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Meet and Confer and Submit Joint Report Under Rule 26 filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 APPENDIX to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #15 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Meet and Confer and Submit Joint Report Under Rule 26 filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Meet and Confer and Submit Joint Report Under Rule 26 by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Mary Young, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Riley, Jared Turner, #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC, re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Mary Young, Defendant The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Defendant Benjamin Riley, Defendant Jared Turner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy, re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Young Living Foundation, Inc.. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C.C. Sanders, Jr on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Benjamin Riley(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party The Young Living Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Jared Turner(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Mary Young(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Young Living Essential Oils, LC(pty:dft) (Sanders, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of Katrina G. Eash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12216516) by on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Benjamin Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party The Young Living Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Jared Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Mary Young(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Young Living Essential Oils, LC(pty:dft) (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11995032). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Shaughnessy v. Young Living Essential Oils, LC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Young Living Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?