Hernandez v. Co-Diagnostics et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Hernandez
Defendant: Co-Diagnostics, Dwight Egan, Reed Benson, Edward Murphy, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin, Eugene Durenard and James Nelson
Petitioner: Stephen Wiley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00481
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Motions No Longer Referred: #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memorandum in Support and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Memorandum in Support Filed on Behalf of Movant Tejeswar Tadi. (ksb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memorandum in Support and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Memorandum in Support Filed on Behalf of Movant Tejeswar Tadi filed by Plaintiff Fernando Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent R. Baker, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency of Action, #3 Exhibit B - Tadi's PSLRA Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Firm Resume of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, #5 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Parsons Behle & Latimer, #6 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Baker, Brent)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Baker on behalf of Fernando Hernandez (Baker, Brent)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Motion for Consolidation of Action, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Fernando Hernandez (Stephens, Mitchell)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing, in Case No. 2:20-cv-00368-CMR, Gelt Trading Co., Ltd. v. Co-Diagnostics, Inc., of Motion of Stephen Wiley for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel by Fernando Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-- Motion of Stephen Wiley for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel; Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit B-- Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman with Exhibits A-E) (Scofield, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/20/2020. (nl)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/17/20. (ss)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/20. (ss)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 3. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Due to the procedural posture and nature of the case, reassignment to a district judge is warranted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/6/2020. (med)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3638049) filed by Fernando Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Fernando Herenandez PSLRA Certification, #3 Appendix Schedule A-- Fernando Hernandez List of Purchases and Sales) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Scofield, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Fernando Hernandez is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Co-Diagnostics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Diagnostics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Satterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Durenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Hernandez
Represented By: David W. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?