Nelson v. Salt Lake City et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Nelson
Defendant: CBI Security Services, Peter Bromberg, Salt Lake City Public Library, Salt Lake City, FNU Corella, Lu Marzulli and Nathan Larson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00509
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for FNU Corella to 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/9/20. (alf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, 2-1 Complaint filed by Defendant FNU Corella. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoagland, Noah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant FNU Corella. (alf)
September 9, 2020 Deadlines terminated as to defendant Lu Marzulli for submission of Consent/Reassignment form. (alf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Peter Bromberg, Lu Marzulli and Salt Lake City Public Library. (alf) Modified on 9/9/2020 to add dft Lu Marzulli - was not on consent form due to limited characters but verified with counsel's office. (alf).
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Salt Lake City. (alf)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Peter Bromberg, CBI Security Services, FNU Corella, Nathan Larson, Lu Marzulli, Salt Lake City, Salt Lake City Public Library, Plaintiff Anthony Nelson. Form due by 9/18/2020. (alf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brennan on behalf of FNU Corella (Brennan, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah M. Hoagland on behalf of FNU Corella (Hoagland, Noah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Salt Lake City. Attorney David F. Mull added to party Salt Lake City(pty:dft)(Mull, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Nelson as to CBI Security Services served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McConkie, Kathleen)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file Attorney Meeting Planning and Report and Proposed Scheduling Order to 8/11/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/5/20. (alf)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time Filing the Attorney Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Anthony Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Lucas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants CBI Security Services, Nathan Larson. (alf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Peter Bromberg, Lu Marzulli, Salt Lake City Public Library.(White, Heather)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by CBI Security Services, Nathan Larson. Attorney Patrick C. Burt added to party CBI Security Services(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick C. Burt added to party Nathan Larson(pty:dft)(Burt, Patrick)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/17/20. (alf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Peter Bromberg, Lu Marzulli, Salt Lake City Public Library, Plaintiff Anthony Nelson. (kn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 File Received- Downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Xchange, consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Acceptance of Service, Notice of Removal and Returns of Electronic Notification for each document. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Return of Electronic Service: Complaint, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 State court Return of Electronic Service: Acceptance of Service, #5 Notice of Removal, #6 State Court Return of Electronic Service: Notice of Removal (alf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA to #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Peter Bromberg, Lu Marzulli, Salt Lake City Public Library . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(White, Heather)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200903929, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3652375) filed by Lu Marzulli, Peter Bromberg, Salt Lake City Public Library. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (White, Heather)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Peter Bromberg, CBI Security Services, FNU Corella, Nathan Larson, Lu Marzulli, Salt Lake City, Salt Lake City Public Library is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Salt Lake City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBI Security Services
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bromberg
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City Public Library
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City
Represented By: David F. Mull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Corella
Represented By: Noah M. Hoagland
Represented By: Robert J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Marzulli
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Larson
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nelson
Represented By: Lucas Mcconkie Adams
Represented By: Kathleen McConkie
Represented By: Dean Collinwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?