Khial v. Saul
Plaintiff: Akram B. Khial
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: SSA Notice
Case Number: 2:2020cv00511
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VIII. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Originally received by the court on 07/16/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Akram B. Khial. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (jl)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/28/2020. (jl)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 07/16/2020) filed by Plaintiff Akram B. Khial. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khial v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram B. Khial
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?