Portoli Investments et al v. Norcap Holdings et al
Plaintiff: BYM, Kish North, Benjamin J. Chapman, Portoli Investments, Norcap 1 and Michelle North
Defendant: Nicholas Legamaro, Norcap Holdings and Eric Sage
Case Number: 2:2020cv00517
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT that this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/22/20 (alt)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - In their amended complaint, Plaintiffs allege that Plaintiff Norcap 1, LLC's member is Defendant Norcap Holdings, LLC, whose members in turn are Defendants Sage and Legamaro. See Dkt. No. 10 5-6. It is well settled that an LLC's citizenship is that of all of its members. See, e.g., Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1234 (10th Cir. 2015). Because Defendant Sage is a citizen of Arizona and Defendant Legamaro is citizen of Texas, see Dkt. No. 10 10-11, both Plaintiff Norcap 1, LLC, and Defendant Norcap Holdings, LLC, are citizens of Arizona and Texas. Absent complete diversity, the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. See, e.g., Strawbridge v. Curtiss, 3 Cranch 267 (1806). This action is accordingly dismissed without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 07/22/2020. (dz)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants. filed by Michelle North, BYM, Kish North, Benjamin J. Chapman, Portoli Investments, Norcap 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A part 1 to Amended Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A part 2 to Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A part 3 to Amended Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Verified Complaint) (Chingas, George)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - It appears Plaintiffs' complaint fails to properly allege subject matter jurisdiction because (1) Plaintiffs only allege the Individual Plaintiffs' and Individual Defendants' residence rather than citizenship, see, e.g., Whitelock v. Leatherman, 460 F.2d 507, 51415 (10th Cir. 1972), and (2) Plaintiffs fail to allege the identity and citizenship of the members of Plaintiff BYM, LLC, Plaintiff Norcap 1, LLC, and Defendant Norcap Holdings, LLC, see Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1234 (10th Cir. 2015). No later than July 27, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint properly alleging subject matter jurisdiction, see 28 U.S.C. 1653, or show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 07/20/2020. (dz)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nicholas Legamaro. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric Sage. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Norcap Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Plaintiffs shall promptly serve Defendants with summons and copies of #2 Complaint, #3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and this Order. No later than seven days after receiving service, Defendants shall file a response to #3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their motion no later than three days after the filing of Defendants' response. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 7/20/2020. (rpm)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Jill N. Parrish recused. Case reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/17/20. (jwt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs BYM, Benjamin J. Chapman, Norcap 1, Kish North, Michelle North, Portoli Investments. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Granting TRO)(Chingas, George)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3654478) filed by Michelle North, BYM, Kish North, Benjamin J. Chapman, Portoli Investments, Norcap 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Verified Complaint pt 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Verified Complaint pt 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Verified Complaint pt 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Verified Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet U.S. District Ct Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Chingas, George)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs BYM, Benjamin J. Chapman, Norcap 1, Kish North, Michelle North, Portoli Investments is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portoli Investments et al v. Norcap Holdings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYM
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kish North
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin J. Chapman
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portoli Investments
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norcap 1
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle North
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Legamaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcap Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?