Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance v. United States Bureau of Land Mangement et al
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Mangement and Harry Barber
Case Number: 2:2020cv00539
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Modification of Docket: Error: Order to Propose Schedule #7 entered erroneously in APA case. Correction: Order is hereby withdrawn per chambers instruction. (alf)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/30/20. (alf) Modified on 8/3/2020 - Order withdrawn per chambers instruction (alf) .
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Huber. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to William Barr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Mangement. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Harry Barber. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3665148) filed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 2:20cv539, #2 Exhibit A: May 8, 2020 L.Pratt letter, #3 Exhibit B: June 8, 2020 SUWA letter, #4 Exhibit C: June 30, 2020 L.Pratt letter, #5 Exhibit D: July 13, 2020 DOJ Notice Order email, #6 Exhibit E: July 16, 2020 SUWA letter, #7 Exhibit F: BLM Instruction Memorandum 2008-175) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Bloch, Stephen)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance v. United States Bureau of Land Mangement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Joseph J. Bushyhead
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Mangement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?