Arthur v. Utah State University et al
Plaintiff: Emily Arthur
Defendant: Jeff Sheen, Heidi Kesler, Utah State University, Sue Reeves, Timothy A. Slocum and Sarah Bodily
Case Number: 2:2020cv00540
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Sarah Bodily answer due 10/2/2020; Heidi Kesler answer due 10/2/2020; Sue Reeves answer due 10/2/2020; Jeff Sheen answer due 10/2/2020; Timothy A. Slocum answer due 10/2/2020; Utah State University answer due 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/23/2020. (nl)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum, Utah State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Goff, Darin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #22 filed by Defendants Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum, Utah State University (Goff, Darin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #22 filed by Plaintiff Emily Arthur (Bearnson, Bradley)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/14/20. (ss)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/14/20. (ss)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Emily Arthur. (alf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum, Utah State University. (alf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Utah State University served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Timothy A. Slocum served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Sue Reeves served on 8/2/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Sarah Bodily served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Jeff Sheen served on 8/3/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Arthur as to Heidi Kesler served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Bearnson, Bradley)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Emily Arthur, Defendants Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum, Utah State University. Form due by 8/28/2020. (alf)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum and Utah State University to 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/13/20. (alf)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Sarah Bodily, Heidi Kesler, Sue Reeves, Jeff Sheen, Timothy A. Slocum, Utah State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Sarah Bodily(pty:dft), Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Heidi Kesler(pty:dft), Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Sue Reeves(pty:dft), Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Jeff Sheen(pty:dft), Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Timothy A. Slocum(pty:dft), Attorney Darin B. Goff added to party Utah State University(pty:dft)(Goff, Darin)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/31/20. (alf)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah State University. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Timothy A. Slocum. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sue Reeves. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sarah Bodily. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Sheen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Heidi Kesler. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BUTDC-3666699) filed by Emily Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initial Documents) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Bearnson, Bradley)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Emily Arthur is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur v. Utah State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sheen
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Kesler
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah State University
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Reeves
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Slocum
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Bodily
Represented By: Darin B. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Arthur
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Wayne K. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?