Wilson et al v. BuyPD et al
Plaintiff: Invicta Legato Investments, Paul Valenti, Re Investor 702, James Dunn, Coyle 12071, Joanne Beldotti, Dennis Houtz, Abby Creek Investment, Greiner 11831, Pascal Vohradnik, Lions Fan, Robert Wong, 13607 Virgil St., Mike Hampshire, Carney Look Wong, Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen, Eva Thode, Kenneth Wong, Rebecca K. Wilson, Layne Lundstrom, Simone Vohradnik, Sherry Valenti, Audrey Lundstrom, Linda Saenz and Sarsfield 12460
Defendant: Red List Homes, Guardian Law, American Cash Fund, Interactive Homes, American Legal and Escrow, Invictus, Red Apple Homes, Veil Corporate, Bud Lethbridge, Ryan Poelman, Dean Grazioisi, Insiders Cash, EZ Street Properties, John Graham Inc., Scott Yancey, Yancey Events, Ready Prop, BuyPD, Expansion Properties, Blair Poelman, DLS Properties, FrontSide Properties, Green Apple Homes, Improvement Homes, Scree 44, Insiders Financial Education, Patriot Homes, Property Education, Screaming Eagle Properties, Malibu Breeze Properties, Income Property USA, Max Ultra, Silver Tie Homes, Yancey LLC, Property Direct and 5 Choices
Case Number: 2:2020cv00558
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs 13607 Virgil St., Abby Creek Investment, Joanne Beldotti, Coyle 12071, James Dunn, Greiner 11831, Mike Hampshire, Dennis Houtz, Invicta Legato Investments, Lions Fan, Audrey Lundstrom, Layne Lundstrom, Re Investor 702, Linda Saenz, Sarsfield 12460, Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen, Eva Thode, Paul Valenti, Sherry Valenti, Pascal Vohradnik, Simone Vohradnik, Rebecca K. Wilson, Carney Look Wong, Kenneth Wong, Robert Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Roddis, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant John Graham Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Michigan Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Order Granting JGI Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Order on Appeal, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Order for Dismissal, #5 Exhibit Ex E - Plaintiff Houtz Property, #6 Exhibit Ex F - Plaintiff Hampshire Property, #7 Exhibit Ex G - Plaintiff Thode Properties)(Zalewski, Paul)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 5 Choices, American Cash Fund, American Legal and Escrow, BuyPD, DLS Properties, EZ Street Properties, Expansion Properties, FrontSide Properties, Dean Grazioisi, Green Apple Homes, Guardian Law, Improvement Homes, Income Property USA, Insiders Cash, Insiders Financial Education, Interactive Homes, Invictus, John Graham Inc., Bud Lethbridge, Malibu Breeze Properties, Max Ultra, Patriot Homes, Blair Poelman, Ryan Poelman, Property Direct, Property Education, Ready Prop, Red Apple Homes, Red List Homes, Screaming Eagle Properties, Scree 44, Silver Tie Homes, Veil Corporate, Scott Yancey, Yancey Events, Yancey LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Coyle 12071, Pascal Vohradnik, Robert Wong, Linda Saenz, Rebecca K. Wilson, 13607 Virgil St., Joanne Beldotti, Re Investor 702, Greiner 11831, Sarsfield 12460, Kenneth Wong, Mike Hampshire, Simone Vohradnik, Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen, Layne Lundstrom, Dennis Houtz, Carney Look Wong, Audrey Lundstrom, Lions Fan, Sherry Valenti, Eva Thode, Paul Valenti, Abby Creek Investment, Invicta Legato Investments, James Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit WW, #51 Exhibit XX, #52 Exhibit YY) (Roddis, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Call on behalf of American Legal and Escrow, Invictus (Call, Keith)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Dismiss Party Guardian Law, LLC and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Guardian Law. Attorney G. James Christiansen added to party Guardian Law(pty:dft)(Christiansen, G.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants American Legal and Escrow, Invictus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michigan Lawsuit Dkt 64-2, #2 Exhibit Standard Mail Service Attempt, #3 Exhibit Fed Ex Service Attempt) Attorney Adam M. Pace added to party American Legal and Escrow(pty:dft), Attorney Adam M. Pace added to party Invictus(pty:dft)(Pace, Adam)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Motions granted: #19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by John Graham Inc. Answer deadline updated for John Graham Inc. answer due 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/31/20. (jrj)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant John Graham Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deiss, Andrew)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J. Zalewski for John Graham Inc..Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/18/20. (jrj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bud Lethbridge. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Zalewski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3686014,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant John Graham Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission) Attorney Andrew G. Deiss added to party John Graham Inc.(pty:dft)(Deiss, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Expansion Properties. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 ERRATA to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs 13607 Virgil St., Abby Creek Investment, Joanne Beldotti, Coyle 12071, James Dunn, Greiner 11831, Mike Hampshire, Dennis Houtz, Invicta Legato Investments, Lions Fan, Audrey Lundstrom, Layne Lundstrom, Re Investor 702, Linda Saenz, Sarsfield 12460, Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen, Eva Thode, Paul Valenti, Sherry Valenti, Pascal Vohradnik, Simone Vohradnik, Rebecca K. Wilson, Carney Look Wong, Kenneth Wong, Robert Wong . (Attachments: #1 Errata Replacement pages)(Roddis, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to BuyPD. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Veil Corporate. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Income Property USA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Insiders Cash. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to American Legal and Escrow. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Guardian Law. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Invictus. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Graham Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Modification of Docket: Error: Document was filed by All Plaintiffs, not just Rebecca K. Wilson. Correction: Modified docket text to reflect it was filed by all plaintiffs; corrected filers re #3 Errata. (rks)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against Plaintiffs. Correction: Modified docket text to reflect complaint was filed against defendants rather than plaintiffs; Answer records corrected re #2 Complaint. (rks)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA to #2 Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs Rebecca K. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Errata Omitted Ex. QQ to Complaint)(Roddis, Robert) Modified by changing text to show document was filed by all plaintiffs on 8/4/2020 (rks).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3669925) filed by 13607 Virgil St.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Opinion, #4 Exhibit B - Final Order, #5 Exhibit C - Yancey ad, #6 Exhibit D - Yancey ad, #7 Exhibit E - Wilson email, #8 Exhibit F - Thode ad, #9 Exhibit G - Hawaii ad, #10 Exhibit H - IP USA, #11 Exhibit I Layne ad, #12 Exhibit J - Yancey ad, #13 Exhibit K - Wilson boots contract, #14 Exhibit L - Wilson B.S. contract, #15 Exhibit M - Bud to Eva email, #16 Exhibit N - G. Law email to Layne, #17 Exhibit O - Workbook page, #18 Exhibit P - Workbook page, #19 Exhibit Q - Fraudulent internet screen, #20 Exhibit R - Alex Nichol screenshot, #21 Exhibit S - Veil letter to Thode, #22 Exhibit T - Wong Release, #23 Exhibit U - S. Eagle Deed, #24 Exhibit V - EZ Street Deed, #25 Exhibit W - Pat. Homes Deed, #26 Exhibit X - Silver Tie Deed, #27 Exhibit Y - M. Breeze Deed, #28 Exhibit Z - Frontside Deed, #29 Exhibit AA - Discharge, #30 Exhibit BB - Discharge, #31 Exhibit CC - Discharge, #32 Exhibit DD - Assignment, #33 Exhibit EE - Assignment, #34 Exhibit FF - Lars Email, #35 Exhibit GG - Lozier printout, #36 Exhibit HH - JGI deed, #37 Exhibit II - JGI deed, #38 Exhibit JJ - Assignment, #39 Exhibit KK - Dashboard, #40 Exhibit LL - R. Poelman BuyPD, #41 Exhibit MM - BuyPD photo, #42 Exhibit NN - Purchase Details, #43 Exhibit OO - Veil email, #44 Exhibit PP - Invictus demand letter, #45 Exhibit RR - Invictus invoice, #46 Exhibit SS - Lade settlement, #47 Exhibit TT - Sellers conflict statement, #48 Exhibit UU - Sellers guaranty, #49 Exhibit VV - Flora conflict statement, #50 Exhibit WW - Lundstrom guaranty) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Roddis, Robert) Modified by changing text to reflect complaint was filed against defendants not plaintiffs on 8/4/2020 (rks).
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiffs 13607 Virgil St., Abby Creek Investment, Joanne Beldotti, Coyle 12071, James Dunn, Greiner 11831, Mike Hampshire, Dennis Houtz, Invicta Legato Investments, Lions Fan, Audrey Lundstrom, Layne Lundstrom, Re Investor 702, Linda Saenz, Sarsfield 12460, Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen, Eva Thode, Paul Valenti, Sherry Valenti, Pascal Vohradnik, Simone Vohradnik, Rebecca K. Wilson, Carney Look Wong, Kenneth Wong, Robert Wong is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. BuyPD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invicta Legato Investments
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Valenti
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Re Investor 702
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dunn
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyle 12071
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Beldotti
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Houtz
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Creek Investment
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greiner 11831
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascal Vohradnik
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lions Fan
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wong
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 13607 Virgil St.
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hampshire
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carney Look Wong
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Lorraine Solano-Owen
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Thode
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wong
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca K. Wilson
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layne Lundstrom
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Vohradnik
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Valenti
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Lundstrom
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Saenz
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarsfield 12460
Represented By: Robert W. Roddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red List Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Law
Represented By: G. James Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cash Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Legal and Escrow
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Adam M. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Adam M. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Apple Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veil Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Lethbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Poelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Grazioisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insiders Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Street Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Graham Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Represented By: Paul J. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancey Events
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready Prop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BuyPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expansion Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Poelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLS Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FrontSide Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Apple Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Improvement Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scree 44
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insiders Financial Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screaming Eagle Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malibu Breeze Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Income Property USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Ultra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Tie Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Direct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Choices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?