Young v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Jennifer Wilson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00597
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting #2 Report and Recommendation and denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 10/07/2020. (dz)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Have Magistrate Judge Removed from Case Entirely filed by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Young v. Superior Court of California, Unnumbered Petition for Review #2 Number of Magistrate Judges in Each State, #3 Dred Scott Fraud, Constitutional Challenge to the 16th Amendment.(lnp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Ms. Young's #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Ms. Young be allowed to resubmit an IFP application that is compliant with the rules or prepay the full filing fee of $400 within 30 days for this action to proceed.IT IS ADDITIONALLY RECOMMENDED that Ms. Young be cautioned that failure to submit a compliant IFP application or full payment of the filing fee by that time will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/16/2020. (lnp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/24/2020) filed by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Appeal Brief)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?