Spevak v. USA
Petitioner: Tiffany Scott Spevak
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00646
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: David Sam
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Sealed Motion to appoint counsel. The court appoints the Federal Defenders Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/5/2020. No attached document. (las)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #3 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support filed by Tiffany Scott Spevak. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/15/2020. (tcs)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioner Tiffany Scott Spevak. (jrj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Judge David Sam no longer assigned to the case. (Judge Sam no longer taking new civil cases) (rks)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Related case: 2:18-cr-137. No filing fee required. AUSA added to the case: Yes. filed by Tiffany Scott Spevak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Assigned to Judge David Sam (jl) Modified on 9/16/2020 by changing date filed (jl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spevak v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tiffany Scott Spevak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Stephen L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?