Greer v. Moon et al
Plaintiff: Russell G. Greer
Defendant: Joshua Moon and Kiwi Farms
Case Number: 2:2020cv00647
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 MOTION REFERRED per 11 Re-Referral Order - #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: motion referred to Jared C. Bennett (alt)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/13/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #4 Motion for Service by Process; granting #5 Pro Se Motion for Email Filing and Notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/9/2020. (jwt)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/29/20 (dcket text only - no attached document) (alt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Russell G. Greer (alt)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Russell G. Greer (alt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (jl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Email Filing and Notification filed by Plaintiff Russell G. Greer. (Attachments: #1 ENotice Registration Form)(jl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication or Other Alternative Means filed by Plaintiff Russell G. Greer. (jl) Modified on 9/25/2020: corrected motion relief and entry text (alt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kiwi Farms, Joshua Moon (Originally received by the court on 09/16/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Russell G. Greer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P, #22 Exhibit Q, #23 Exhibit R, #24 Exhibit S, #25 Exhibit T, #26 Exhibit U, #27 Exhibit V, #28 Exhibit W, #29 Exhibit X, #30 Exhibit Y, #31 Exhibit Z) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (jl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2020: #32 Civil Cover Sheet 1) (jl).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/24/2020. (jl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 09/16/2020) filed by Plaintiff Russell G. Greer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Moon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiwi Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell G. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?