Aguilera v. Egan et al
Plaintiff: Luis Aguilera
Defendant: Co-Diagnostics, Dwight Egan, Reed Benson, Edward Murphy, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin, Eugene Durenard and James Nelson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00654
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE OF POSSIBLE ERROR re #25 Notice of Appearance, #26 Notice of Appearance, #27 Notice of Appearance. Description of possible error: counsel filed #27 Notice of Appearance. Counsel already appeared per #25 Notice of Appearance and the document attached to #27 appears to be a duplicate of the appearances filed co-counsel as #26 Notice of Appearance. Both counsel show appearing for the defendants so no correction is required. (jwt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James Adam Knorr on behalf of Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin (Knorr, James)
November 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B. Hancey on behalf of Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin (Hancey, Ryan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James Adam Knorr on behalf of Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin (Knorr, James)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Claudio Simpkins for Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Charles Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield and Richard Serbin.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/29/20. (alf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Claudio Simpkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3747797,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Smith, Ashley)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Eugene Durenard Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Dwight Egan Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Edward Murphy Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Brent Satterfield Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Richard Serbin Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to James Nelson Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luis Aguilera as to Reed Benson Waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Hoffman, Jeremy)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher P. Milazzo for Reed Benson,Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield,and Richard Serbin.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/08/2020. (nl)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Claudio Simpkins Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/08/2020. (nl) Modified by adding name of attorney on 10/8/2020 (rks).
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher P. Milazzo , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3747885,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Smith, Ashley)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Claudio Simpkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3747797,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ashley)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael D. Nacht for Co-Diagnostics.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/01/2020. (nl)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Nacht , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3739145,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission) Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Reed Benson(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Co-Diagnostics(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Eugene Durenard(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Dwight Egan(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Edward Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party James Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Brent Satterfield(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Garbe Smith added to party Richard Serbin(pty:dft)(Smith, Ashley)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Co-Diagnostics. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/23/2020. (nl)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/20. (ss)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/20. (ss)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney and #4 Motion to Amend Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy Brown for Luis Aguilera.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/21/2020. (nl)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Brown , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3726576,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case a filed by Plaintiff Luis Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Hoffman, Jeremy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Brown , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3726576,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Luis Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PHV for T. Brown)(Hoffman, Jeremy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3723189) filed by Luis Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Hoffman, Jeremy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Luis Aguilera is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilera v. Egan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Diagnostics
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Egan
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Benson
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Murphy
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Satterfield
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Serbin
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Durenard
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nelson
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Ashley Garbe Smith
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Represented By: James Adam Knorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Aguilera
Represented By: Scott L. Sackett, II
Represented By: Jeremy M. Hoffman
Represented By: Timothy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?