IHC Health Services Inc. v. Omnicom Group et al
Plaintiff: IHC Health Services Inc. doing business as McKay-Dee Hospital
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare of Utah and Omnicom Group
Case Number: 2:2020cv00680
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #6 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for all Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/24/2020. No attached document. (eh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendants Cigna Healthcare of Utah, Omnicom Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Attorney Todd C. Duffield added to party Cigna Healthcare of Utah(pty:dft), Attorney Todd C. Duffield added to party Omnicom Group(pty:dft)(Duffield, Todd)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by IHC Health Services Inc. as to Cigna Healthcare of Utah Waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Schaap, Marcie)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/30/20. (jrj)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/29/20. (tlc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3734133) filed by IHC Health Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Schaap, Marcie)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff IHC Health Services Inc. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IHC Health Services Inc. v. Omnicom Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare of Utah
Represented By: Todd C. Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicom Group
Represented By: Todd C. Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IHC Health Services Inc. doing business as McKay-Dee Hospital
Represented By: Joseph David Amadon
Represented By: Marcie E. Schaap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?