Mike Ferry Organization, The v. Burns et al
Plaintiff: Mike Perry Organization, The and Mike Ferry Organization, The
Defendant: Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Good Job Great Corporation, Good Job and Erica Carter
Case Number: 2:2020cv00684
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 39 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Baskin, Joshua)
November 25, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Mike Ferry Organization, The. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Baskin, Joshua)
November 24, 2020 Filing 37 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Matthew J. Orme replacing Shane William Clayton as counsel on behalf of Mike Ferry Organization, The. (Orme, Matthew)
November 23, 2020 Filing 36 Motions No Longer Referred: #35 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support against plaintiff The Mike Ferry Organization & Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar law firm (eh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support against plaintiff The Mike Ferry Organization & Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar law firm filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Grady, Douglas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns.(Grady, Douglas)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Declaration of Christopher Burns in Support of Opposition to Temporary Restraining Order. The unredacted versions of Mr. Burns' declaration and exhibits (Doc. No. 18 and all attachments) shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/4/2020. No attached document. (med)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Bit Gooey and Christopher Burns to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/2/2020. No attached document. (med)
November 2, 2020 Filing 31 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Nadesan, Karthik)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/30/20. (dla)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/29/2020. (mjm)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua A. Baskin for Mike Ferry Organization, The.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/22/20. (dla)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John P. Flynn for Mike Ferry Organization, The.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/22/20. (dla)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colleen Bal for Mike Ferry Organization, The.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/22/20. (dla)
October 22, 2020 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Flynn , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3768084,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Mike Ferry Organization, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clayton, Shane)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua A. Baskin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3768068,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Mike Ferry Organization, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clayton, Shane)
October 22, 2020 Filing 23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colleen Bal , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3768034,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Mike Ferry Organization, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clayton, Shane)
October 20, 2020 NAME CORRECTION of Mike Perry Organization, The. Corrected Name: Mike Ferry Organization, The. Refer to document number: #2 . Name entered incorrectly at case opening. (rks)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Good Job Great Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Mike Perry Organization, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Clayton, Shane)
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Plaintiff Mike Perry Organization, The re #7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Mike Perry Organization, The . (Clayton, Shane)
October 19, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Andre Gougisha re #18 Sealed Document, filed by Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. (Grady, Douglas)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE VACATING Motion Hearing HEARING set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Robert J. Shelby (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) (mjm)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #16 Response to Motion, filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica CarterNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Affidavit)(Grady, Douglas)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Document #16 Response to Motion, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. (Grady, Douglas)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Burns, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Grady, Douglas)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 10/13/2020,Counsel, court, and court reporter present by Zoom video conference. Mr. Wade intends to file a motion to dismiss Good Job, LLC. Mr. Wade stated that there was a typographical error - the damage amount is in excess of $150,000, not $15,000. The motion for TRO was filed on 10/7/2020. Court set the following briefing schedule: 10/15/2020 Response to TRO motion;10/19/2020 Reply to TRO motion. Hearing 10/21/2020 at.10:00 a.m. by Zoom video conference. Any supplemental declarations/affidavits from each side, the attorneys to meet and confer on 10/20/2020. If the matter is resolved prior to the hearing date, counsel to notify the court.Court adjourned. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support :( Responses due by 10/15/2020, Replies due by 10/19/2020., Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judges Chambers before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Attorney for Plaintiff: Chris Wade, Attorney for Defendant: Douglas Grady, Karthik Nadeson, Erica Youngstrom. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken.(Time Start: 3:05, Time End: 3:15, Room Video Conference.)(asb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. (Grady, Douglas)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200906091, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3754801) filed by Christopher Burns, Bit Gooey, Erica Carter. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Grady, Douglas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO HEARING ON MOTION AND STATUS CONFERENCE re: #7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) ZOOM Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Robert J. Shelby. ZOOM Instructions will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 10/9/2020. Plaintiffs decision and corresponding email to all parties is due tomorrow 10/10/2020 by noon. Defendants reply to Plaintiff's filing is due Tuesday 10/13/2020 by noon. The next hearing to discuss the parties briefs and the TRO motion is Tuesday 10/13/2020 at 3:00pm.Plaintiff counsel: Shane William Clayton; Defendant counsel: Douglas Anderson Grady, Karthik Nadesan. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken (mjm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) ZOOM Video Status & Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 2:00 PM (MST) before Judge Robert J. Shelby, re: docket entry #7 Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiff Mike Perry Organization. Counsel for the Defendants should appear ready to discuss the basis for federal subject matter jurisdiction. ZOOM Instructions will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE VACATING Status & Scheduling Conference HEARING set for 10/8/2020 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Robert J. Shelby (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) (mjm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) ZOOM Video Status & Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 3:00 PM (MST) before Judge Robert J. Shelby, re: docket entry #7 Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiff Mike Perry Organization. Counsel for the Defendants should appear ready to discuss the basis for federal subject matter jurisdiction. ZOOM Instructions will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Mike Perry Organization, The. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sabrina Ferry, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Fursman, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Charlene Renwick, #4 Exhibit Complaint - Washington State, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Clayton, Shane)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas A. Grady for Bit Gooey,Douglas A. Grady for Christopher Burns,Douglas A. Grady for Erica Carter.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/30/20. (dla)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Modification of Docket: Error: Good Job and Good Job Great Corporation do not have counsel and should not have been added to the ADR Notice.. Correction: Removed Good Job and Good Job Great Corporation from Notice of ADR.. (dw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas A. Grady , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3737075,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadesan, Karthik)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter,Good Job, Good Job Great Corporation, Plaintiff Mike Perry Organization, The. (dw) Modified on 9/30/2020 (dw).
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200906091, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3736411) filed by Christopher Burns, Bit Gooey, Erica Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Bit Gooey, Burns, Carter Summonses, #3 Exhibit C: Good Job, Great Corporation, Good Job LLC Summonses, #4 Exhibit D: State Court Docket, Case File, #5 Exhibit E: Delaware and Utah Business Entity Details, #6 Exhibit F: Good Job, Great Corporation Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Nadesan, Karthik)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Defendants Bit Gooey, Christopher Burns, Erica Carter is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Ferry Organization, The v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bit Gooey
Represented By: Karthik Nadesan
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Burns
Represented By: Karthik Nadesan
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Job Great Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Job
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Carter
Represented By: Karthik Nadesan
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Perry Organization, The
Represented By: Shane William Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Ferry Organization, The
Represented By: Shane William Clayton
Represented By: Joshua A. Baskin
Represented By: John P. Flynn
Represented By: Colleen Bal
Represented By: Matthew J. Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?