THS LLC v. Atlatl Group, The et al
Plaintiff: THS LLC
Defendant: Atlatl Group, The an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Bravada Yachts, Robert Gutierrez, Aaron Browning and Andrew Marshall
Case Number: 2:2020cv00695
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Atlatl Group, The. (lnp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to The Atlatl Group, LLC filed by Plaintiff THS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(lnp)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons and Complaint served on The Atlatl Group, LLC on 10/08/2020, filed by Plaintiff THS LLC. (Beckstrand, Dwight)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/8/2020. (lnp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/6/2020. (lnp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Gutierrez. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Aaron Browning. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Atlatl Group, The. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Marshall. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3741984) filed by THS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet (signed)) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Beckstrand, Dwight)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff THS LLC is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THS LLC v. Atlatl Group, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THS LLC
Represented By: Dwight G. Beckstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlatl Group, The an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Bravada Yachts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?