State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance v. CMW Enterprises et al
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance
Defendant: Jared Swensen, Stewart Roth and CMW Enterprises doing business as CW Concrete & Asphalt
Case Number: 2:2020cv00698
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including December 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/2/2020. (lnp)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy C. Reutzel on behalf of CMW Enterprises, Stewart Roth (Reutzel, Jeremy)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants CMW Enterprises, Stewart Roth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Deadline to Respond to Complaint) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Shane L. Keppner added to party CMW Enterprises(pty:dft), Attorney Shane L. Keppner added to party Stewart Roth (pty:dft)(Keppner, Shane) Modified on 11/2/2020 by changing event and modifying text (lnp).
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance as to CMW Enterprises served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Martin, Byron)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance as to Stewart Roth served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Martin, Byron)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance as to Jared Swensen served on 10/10/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Martin, Byron)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance identifying State Auto Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Martin, Byron)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stewart Roth. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to CMW Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jared Swensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/7/2020. (lnp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/6/2020. (lnp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3742478) filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Martin, Byron)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance v. CMW Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Swensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Roth
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Represented By: Shane L. Keppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMW Enterprises doing business as CW Concrete & Asphalt
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Represented By: Shane L. Keppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Byron G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?